|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 14/03/1948 | 19/04/1948 | 37 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to BR 61192 |
||
Gorton Works | 27/11/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 9741 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/07/1949 | 02/07/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 25/02/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1953 | 31/01/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 28200 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1955 | 21/05/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1955 | 15/10/1955 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/12/1955 | 13/01/1956 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1957 | 13/04/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/11/1958 | 29/12/1958 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28601 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/07/1960 | 08/09/1960 | 45 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/08/1961 | 23/09/1961 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1961 | 16/11/1961 | 38 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/04/1962 | 02/05/1962 | 16 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
27/03/1953 | Merchant Navy problems - \"foreign\" locos drafted in | The temporary withdrawal of the 'Merchant Navy' engines for special examination, has led to the drafting of a number of strangers from other regions. Several V2 have been seen, among them 60829 an 60893; also the following Bl, Nos. 61133, 61192, 61354. From the L.M.R. come 45061, 45130 (latter seen passing Basingstoke on 30th May), and from W.R. at least, 70017 an 70024. There are certainly others, but at the time of going to press, no official notes have given details. | SLS/195306 |
11/11/1961 | Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D17, D249/51/79, D3317 D4079-81, D5102/49/68-73, 43141, 60859/64/91, 60952, 61020/4, 61129/92, 61218/89, 61382, 63405, 68025, 90067, 90333/44/63, 90445, 92194/5. Works Yard: D245/74, D2246, D3228, 12113, 46450/80, 60856, 60916/23/48, 61008, 61216/20/57, 63342/59, 63419/69, 65099, 65769, 65821/60, 67647, 67762, 68007/50, 69008, 78026, 80069, 90009, 90450, 92183. Stripping Shop: 61415/47. Outside Stripping Shop: 60939, 63435, 65691. Crossing: D272, D351 D3140, D4078, D5096, D5101/67, 60806. Scrap Yard: 61411-4/9/22/3/31/6/60, 65741, 67707/13/7/22/75/94, 68675/92, 68702 intact. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1192 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26093 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
14/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/03/1948. Dep: 19/04/1948. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 61192 |
||
27/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9741 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/07/1949. Dep: 02/07/1949. | ||
21/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
10/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
07/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28132 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
27/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
15/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
27/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
20/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28200 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. | ||
29/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1955. Dep: 15/10/1955. | ||
30/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/12/1955. Dep: 13/01/1956. | ||
20/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1957. Dep: 13/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28808 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1958. Dep: 29/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28601 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/07/1960. Dep: 08/09/1960. | ||
24/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
30/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/08/1961. Dep: 23/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28107 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/10/1961. Dep: 16/11/1961. | ||
12/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
17/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/04/1962. Dep: 02/05/1962. | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61192 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
22/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |