|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1949 | 23/06/1949 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 9849 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61191 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/05/1951 | 16/06/1951 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/06/1951 | 19/06/1951 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/04/1953 | 06/06/1953 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1954 | 30/11/1954 | 15 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/03/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1955 | 01/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/09/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/11/1957 | 09/11/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1957 | 22/11/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/06/1959 | 16/07/1959 | 23 days | Heavy Intermediate | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1961 | 26/04/1961 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1961 | 25/08/1961 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28462 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/09/1962 | 25/10/1962 | 27 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/12/1963 | 08/02/1964 | 41 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
17/05/1947 | Eastfield MPD | New 'B1' were much in evidence here, Nos. 1191/2 on 17/5, Nos. 1194/5 on 24/5, and Nos. 1193-1197 on 31/5. 'Austerity' 2-8-0 No. 77367 was noted on 17/5, not re-numbered L.N.E. No. 3019 as stated in the Journal. (Officially given by the Co. as re-numbered to 3019 on 2/2/47.-Editor). Further 'Austerity' 2-8-0 noted here during the month ended 31/5 were: Nos. 77078, 77225, 71306, 77456, 77470 and 78568; also '07' Nos. 3020, 3089, and 3120. All appeared to be awaiting shop repair. (K.M.). | SLS/194708 |
31/05/1947 | Queens Park Works | During May eight new Class 'B.1' 4-6-0's appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1190-1197 inclusive. Up to 27/6 another eleven 'B.1's' had appeared, viz., Nos. 1198-1208. They were ex Works as follows: 1196 (27/5), 1197 (29/5), 1198 (3/6), 1199 (4/6), 1200 (6/6), 1201 (10/6), 1202 (12/6), 1203 (17/6), 1204 (19/6), 1205 and 1206 (24/6), and 1207 and 1208 . (27/6). Works' Nos. checked are as follows: Nos. 1190-1205 (26091-26106/47) and No. 1207 (26108/47). | SLS/194708 |
06/07/1961 | Eastfield MPD (Waiting Works) | Waiting Works: 61191. Ex-Works: 61340, 61403, 90758. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1191 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 26092 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
18/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1949. Dep: 23/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9849 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61191 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
05/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1951. Dep: 16/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28324 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/06/1951. Dep: 19/06/1951. | ||
21/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
27/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
15/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1953. Dep: 06/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
01/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. | ||
31/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955. | ||
30/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28412 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
06/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/11/1957. Dep: 09/11/1957. | ||
20/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/11/1957. Dep: 22/11/1957. | ||
24/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/06/1959. Dep: 16/07/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
20/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1961. Dep: 26/04/1961. | ||
27/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28462 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/09/1962. Dep: 25/10/1962. | ||
30/12/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1963. Dep: 08/02/1964. | ||
21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61191 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw |