|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 02/10/1947 | 02/10/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Stub axle to weld |
||
Darlington Works | 02/12/1949 | 29/12/1949 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 9835 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61189 |
||
Darlington Works | 02/11/1951 | 27/11/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/12/1951 | 07/12/1951 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 07/09/1953 | 01/10/1953 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Darlington Works | 07/10/1953 | 10/10/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1955 | 24/11/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1958 | 02/09/1958 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 09/09/1958 | 30/09/1958 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1959 | 16/02/1959 | 14 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/11/1962 | 12/12/1962 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/08/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1189 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5547 Allocated to Stockton (SKN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1947. Dep: 02/10/1947. Work undertaken: Stub axle to weld |
||
12/1947 | Naming | Named 'SIR WILLIAM GRAY' | ||
02/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1949. Dep: 29/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9835 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61189 |
||
02/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1951. Dep: 27/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/12/1951. Dep: 07/12/1951. | ||
07/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/09/1953. Dep: 01/10/1953. | ||
07/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/10/1953. Dep: 10/10/1953. | ||
31/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1955. Dep: 24/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/09/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
30/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1958. Dep: 02/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
09/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1958. Dep: 30/09/1958. | ||
03/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1959. Dep: 16/02/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
20/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
12/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1962. Dep: 12/12/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28419 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
13/11/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
15/01/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61189 from York (North) (50A) | ||
07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |