|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 27/01/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9829 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61188 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1951 | 23/06/1951 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1954 | 15/01/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/01/1956 | 20/01/1956 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 19/04/1956 | 26/04/1956 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 18/04/1957 | 17/05/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1959 | 30/04/1959 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28807 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1960 | 08/03/1960 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1960 | 09/11/1960 | 21 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1961 | 03/06/1961 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28252 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1956 | York MPD | December, 1955-January, 1956. On 28/12/55 60152 (64B), ex-works, was in York shed yard, and 60161 (64B) in similar circumstances on 5/1/56. 67764 (53B) was also at York on 28/12/55 en route for Darlington Works, whilst 67724 (30A) which had called at York, in rather poor condition, on 9/11/55, returned southward bound from Darlington Works on 12/1/56 in a more attractive state. On 29/12/55 new B.R. Standard Class 5 4-6-0 73106 from Doncaster was at York, with 76024 (52C) passing through for Doncaster Works. On the following day a very smart 60919 (61B) worked an up goods into Dringhouses during the course of running-in. from Darlington. On 4/1/56 44592 (5B) was an unusual visitor to York, whilst 63760 (54B) put in an appearance while on route for overhaul at Gorton. On the same day three very rusty and forlorn 'Sl' 0-8-4Ts were at York en route for scrapping at Darlington, namely 69900 (36A), 69902 (36B), 69904 (36B). 69900/04 were hauled in by 61188 (38A) in particularly smart trim. 69902 was still at York on the following day which was also marked by the unusual simultaneous appearance in York station of two 'B17s', 61626 (31A) and 61656 (32A); the former brought in the 7.20 a.m. Colchester to Newcastle train which has also recently produced Woodford V2s 60890 an 60915 instead of the more-usual Doncaster or March engine. On 12/1/56 unusual visitors were 43088 (35A), and from the L.M.R. 44692 (24A) and 45211 (25G). The beginning of the year saw the number of 'J25s' in store at York south shed reduced to two, i.e., 65675 an 65677, but the ex-L.M.S.. shed still contains 69864 (50G), 62702 (50A), 62746 (50D) and 62761 (50D) in store. 62730 (50A) is still dumped out of service in the north shed yard but 62345 is at last showing signs of awakening from her-very prolonged hibernation. |
SLS/195605 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1188 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5546 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
27/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9829 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61188 |
||
10/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/05/1951. Dep: 23/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28810 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
21/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28841 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
27/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
04/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1954. Dep: 15/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28279 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/01/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/01/1956. Dep: 20/01/1956. | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 26/04/1956. | ||
18/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1957. Dep: 17/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
07/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
23/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1959. Dep: 30/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28807 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/03/1960. Dep: 08/03/1960. | ||
20/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 20/10/1960. Dep: 09/11/1960. | ||
08/05/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1961. Dep: 03/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28252 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61188 from Colwick (40E) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |