|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 10/02/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9742 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61187 |
||
Gorton Works | 22/11/1950 | 13/01/1951 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1951 | 17/01/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/03/1952 | 04/04/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1953 | 19/12/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28334 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/06/1955 | 22/07/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1957 | 04/04/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28177 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/10/1958 | 18/11/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28196 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
04/11/1959 | 20/12/1959 | 47 days | Light Casual | ||||
Darlington Works | 29/07/1960 | 02/09/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/08/1947 | C.L.C. | New 'Bl' No. 1187 was noted recently on the 4.15 p.m. Liverpool-Hull express carrying a G.E. type headcode in place of the usual lamps. This would appear to be a new departure for this district. | SLS/194710 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1187 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5545 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
10/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9742 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61187 |
||
22/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1950. Dep: 13/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28280 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1951. Dep: 17/01/1951. | ||
02/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1952. Dep: 04/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1953. Dep: 19/12/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28334 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
27/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1955. Dep: 22/07/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28180 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1957. Dep: 04/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28177 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1958. Dep: 18/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28196 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/11/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. | ||
03/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
09/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
29/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1960. Dep: 02/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28226 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/11/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61187 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
19/09/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |