|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 05/01/1949 | 24/02/1949 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61186 |
||
Gorton Works | 29/08/1949 | 01/10/1949 | 34 days | Heavy Casual | Cylinders ex1497 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/07/1951 | 25/08/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28337 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1951 | 29/08/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1955 | 18/06/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28457 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1957 | 28/06/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28249 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/04/1959 | 26/05/1959 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1959 | 10/06/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1960 | 12/10/1960 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/08/1961 | 08/09/1961 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 26/09/1961 | 04/10/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1962 | 14/08/1962 | 19 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
16/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1186 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5544 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
05/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1949. Dep: 24/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3869 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61186 |
||
29/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 29/08/1949. Dep: 01/10/1949. Work undertaken: Cylinders ex1497 |
||
16/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/07/1951. Dep: 25/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28337 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/08/1951. Dep: 29/08/1951. | ||
15/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28449 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 18/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28457 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1957. Dep: 28/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28249 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
28/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1959. Dep: 26/05/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/06/1959. Dep: 10/06/1959. | ||
20/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/09/1960. Dep: 12/10/1960. | ||
17/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1961. Dep: 08/09/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/09/1961. Dep: 04/10/1961. | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 14/08/1962. | ||
05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61186 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
12/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |