|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/04/1905 | 26/05/1905 | 37 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 06/01/1949 | 04/03/1949 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 9747 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61183 |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1952 | 20/02/1953 | 79 days | General | Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/05/1956 | 11/06/1956 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 01/11/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 08/02/1958 | 11/03/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1959 | 24/12/1959 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28571 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1961 | 04/02/1961 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1962 | 05/07/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/04/1905 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1905. Dep: 26/05/1905. | ||
09/07/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1183 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5541 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
06/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1949. Dep: 04/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9747 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61183 |
||
26/05/1951 | Modification | Diagram 100A number 28318 boiler fitted | ||
04/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1952. Dep: 20/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28547 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1956. Dep: 11/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 01/11/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. | ||
08/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1959. Dep: 24/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28571 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/01/1961. Dep: 04/02/1961. | ||
07/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
05/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 05/07/1962. Dep: 05/07/1962. | ||
09/07/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61183 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) |