|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/02/1949 | 26/03/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 9839 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61179 |
||
Gorton Works | 06/09/1951 | 27/10/1951 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1951 | 31/10/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1951 | 02/11/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1952 | 11/12/1952 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 01/07/1953 | 12/08/1953 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1953 | 26/08/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 16/01/1954 | 23/01/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1955 | 06/12/1955 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 22/05/1957 | 21/06/1957 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/02/1959 | 26/03/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/03/1962 | 06/04/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1179 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5537 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
10/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
13/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1949. Dep: 26/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9839 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61179 |
||
06/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/09/1951. Dep: 27/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28815 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/10/1951. Dep: 31/10/1951. | ||
01/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/11/1951. Dep: 02/11/1951. | ||
25/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1952. Dep: 11/12/1952. | ||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 12/08/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28574 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/08/1953. Dep: 26/08/1953. | ||
16/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/01/1954. Dep: 23/01/1954. | ||
02/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/10/1955. Dep: 06/12/1955. | ||
22/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1957. Dep: 21/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28404 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
19/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1959. Dep: 26/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/03/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1962. Dep: 06/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
14/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
10/01/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61179 from Immingham (40B) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |