|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/10/1947 | 13/10/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1949 | 17/03/1949 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 9757 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61166 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/08/1949 | 24/08/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/08/1950 | 16/08/1950 | 3 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/12/1950 | 24/01/1951 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/12/1952 | 23/01/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1953 | 19/09/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 10/05/1954 | 12/06/1954 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1954 | 18/06/1954 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/02/1955 | 04/03/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/05/1956 | 18/05/1956 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 11/11/1959 | 17/12/1959 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28444 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1166 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5524 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
13/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/10/1947. Dep: 13/10/1947. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
06/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1949. Dep: 17/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9757 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61166 |
||
23/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1949. Dep: 24/08/1949. | ||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 16/08/1950. | ||
31/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1950. Dep: 24/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28124 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 23/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1953. Dep: 19/09/1953. | ||
10/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/05/1954. Dep: 12/06/1954. | ||
15/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/06/1954. Dep: 18/06/1954. | ||
06/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1955. Dep: 04/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28305 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 02/05/1956. Dep: 18/05/1956. | ||
11/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28179 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1959. Dep: 17/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28444 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61166 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
05/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon |