|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 29/07/1948 | 04/09/1948 | 38 days | Light Repair | After collision Renumbered to BR 61159 |
||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1949 | 30/07/1949 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/02/1951 | 08/02/1951 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/04/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/06/1951 | 07/06/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 16/01/1953 | 07/02/1953 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1953 | 28/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1954 | 10/04/1954 | 47 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 02/10/1954 | 29/10/1954 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/02/1956 | 19/03/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28178 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/06/1956 | 20/06/1956 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1957 | 17/04/1957 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/01/1959 | 07/02/1959 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28271 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/02/1959 | 26/02/1959 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/04/1961 | 20/05/1961 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/01/1959 | Doncaster MPD (On shed, waiting Works) | On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). | SLS/195902 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/05/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1159 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5517 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1948. Dep: 04/09/1948. Work undertaken: After collision Renumbered to BR 61159 |
||
08/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1949. Dep: 30/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9428 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/02/1951. Dep: 08/02/1951. | ||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/06/1951. Dep: 07/06/1951. | ||
16/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1953. Dep: 07/02/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28278 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1953. Dep: 28/10/1953. | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 10/04/1954. | ||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
02/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1954. Dep: 29/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1956. Dep: 19/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28178 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/06/1956. Dep: 20/06/1956. | ||
14/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1957. Dep: 17/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28875 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1959. Dep: 07/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28271 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/02/1959. Dep: 26/02/1959. | ||
27/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1961. Dep: 20/05/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28421 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61159 from Immingham (40B) | ||
11/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |