|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/08/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9841 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61150 |
||
Gorton Works | 04/02/1949 | 12/02/1949 | 9 days | Light Casual | Stub axle to repair |
||
Gorton Works | 02/08/1950 | 30/09/1950 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/10/1950 | 07/10/1950 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 26/02/1952 | 20/03/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/05/1953 | 08/07/1953 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 05/12/1953 | 16/01/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1954 | 05/03/1954 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1955 | 17/11/1955 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28151 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1957 | 24/10/1957 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 27/10/1957 | 05/11/1957 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/12/1959 | 02/01/1960 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/02/1961 | 02/03/1961 | 27 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
29/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1150 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5508 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
01/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9841 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61150 |
||
04/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/02/1949. Dep: 12/02/1949. Work undertaken: Stub axle to repair |
||
02/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1950. Dep: 30/09/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1950. Dep: 07/10/1950. | ||
26/02/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1952. Dep: 20/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/05/1953. Dep: 08/07/1953. | ||
05/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1953. Dep: 16/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. | ||
17/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/02/1954. Dep: 05/03/1954. | ||
15/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1955. Dep: 17/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28151 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1957. Dep: 24/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28820 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/10/1957. Dep: 05/11/1957. | ||
08/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1959. Dep: 02/01/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28580 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/02/1961. Dep: 02/03/1961. | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61150 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |