|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 12/06/1947 | 13/06/1947 | 2 days | Light Repair | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/11/1948 | 27/11/1948 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 9732 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61147 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1950 | 26/08/1950 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1952 | 26/09/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28620 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/10/1953 | 07/11/1953 | 13 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/05/1954 | 19/06/1954 | 32 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1955 | 08/10/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
14/10/1955 | 18/11/1955 | 36 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 12/12/1955 | 14/01/1956 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1957 | 31/08/1957 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28637 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/10/1957 | 02/11/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/04/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 22 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/10/1959 | 19/11/1959 | 22 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1960 | 10/12/1960 | 32 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28604 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1961 | 29/04/1961 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/08/1961 | 07/10/1961 | 41 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1963 | 06/04/1963 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 23/01/1964 | 21/02/1964 | 30 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/04/1963 | Eastfield MPD (waiting Works) | 61008 transferred from LMR, ex Works-65916/32, and waiting Works-44194, 45713/24, 57653, 61147/80/346, 64527, 64790/814/44/69/97/910/24/9, 90060 an 90759. | SLS/196304 |
18/01/1964 | Bedford MPD (Shopped) | Since the change over from steam to diesel in August, 1963, this depot has had no regular allocation but from 18th January the official allocation (previously O/L) is D4135/6 an D5379/80/1/2/3. | SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 | Inverurie Works (Shopped) | Shopped: 44722, 61147, 64558/99, 65931, D3548, D6139/53. Scrapped: 60089/98, 60159/62, 60804/38, 64603, 64579, 90058. In shops: 45011, 44880, 45194, 65915, D5328. Being Cut Up: 61177. | SLS/196403 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1147 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5505 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1947. Dep: 13/06/1947. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
02/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1948. Dep: 27/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9732 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61147 |
||
03/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
09/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) | ||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 26/08/1950. | ||
14/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
04/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
01/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1952. Dep: 26/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28620 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/05/1954. Dep: 19/06/1954. | ||
19/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/09/1955. Dep: 08/10/1955. | ||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 14/01/1956. | ||
27/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1957. Dep: 31/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28637 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/10/1957. Dep: 02/11/1957. | ||
24/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. | ||
29/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/10/1959. Dep: 19/11/1959. | ||
09/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/11/1960. Dep: 10/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28604 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1961. Dep: 29/04/1961. | ||
28/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/08/1961. Dep: 07/10/1961. | ||
27/03/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/03/1963. Dep: 06/04/1963. | ||
23/01/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 23/01/1964. Dep: 21/02/1964. | ||
04/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
16/12/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61147 from Dundee Tay Bridge (62B) | ||
01/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |