|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 18/09/1947 | 18/09/1947 | 1 day | Unclassified | Electric lighting fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1948 | 06/01/1949 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9724 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61143 |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1949 | 24/03/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electric generator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1949 | 25/10/1949 | 2 days | Light Casual | Electric generator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/10/1950 | 16/11/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/05/1952 | 01/07/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1952 | 02/01/1953 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 12/06/1954 | 24/07/1954 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/07/1956 | 30/08/1956 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28296 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 08/11/1956 | 26/11/1956 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1957 | 06/11/1957 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/03/1959 | 18/04/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1959 | 17/11/1959 | 14 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/07/1961 | 25/08/1961 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1961 | 08/11/1961 | 21 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/06/1947 | General | Works Nos. checked of new 'B1' ex Vulcan Foundry are as follows: Nos. 1140-1145 (5498-5503), 1151 (5509), 1157 (5515) and 1158 (5516). | SLS/194708 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
15/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1143 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5501 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
23/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
18/09/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/09/1947. Dep: 18/09/1947. Work undertaken: Electric lighting fitted |
||
27/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1948. Dep: 06/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9724 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61143 |
||
23/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1949. Dep: 24/03/1949. Work undertaken: Electric generator fitted |
||
24/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/10/1949. Dep: 25/10/1949. Work undertaken: Electric generator fitted |
||
17/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1950. Dep: 16/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28111 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
06/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
12/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
09/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
15/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
28/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1952. Dep: 01/07/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1952. Dep: 02/01/1953. | ||
12/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1954. Dep: 24/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
27/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1956. Dep: 30/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28296 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1956. Dep: 26/11/1956. | ||
25/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/10/1957. Dep: 06/11/1957. | ||
17/11/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
16/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1959. Dep: 18/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/11/1959. Dep: 17/11/1959. | ||
31/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1961. Dep: 25/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1961. Dep: 08/11/1961. | ||
24/02/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61143 from Immingham (40B) | ||
13/03/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |