|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/01/1949 | 02/02/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9685 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61139 |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/07/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 44 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/10/1950 | 23/11/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1952 | 18/08/1952 | 36 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 02/03/1954 | 09/04/1954 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28589 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1955 | 16/12/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1958 | 01/03/1958 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1960 | 20/05/1960 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | Queens Park Works | During March five new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1134-1138. Nos. 1134 , 1135 , 1136 , 1137 , 1138 . No. 1139 (the last of the present batch) appeared on 1/4. Works' Nos. checked are: 1134/5 (25890/91 of 1946), 1138/9 (25894/95 of 1946). | SLS/194705 |
31/01/1949 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives in Works at the end of January, included Nos. 53, 88, 90, 95, 110, 800/59/84/93, 922/30/44/67, 3491, 3959/75/85, 4200/68, 5005/08/14 an 60045. 884, 930 and 3959 were in for light repairs. The following are ex Works painted green:-Nos. 60514 an 60524, while those painted black and fully lined are: Nos. 1904/14, 61139/44/93, 61805 an 61883. New 'A.1' No. 60123 was ready for trial, but the next batch of six were held up awaiting materials. | SLS/194903 |
30/06/1952 | Excursion traffic | 'B1' 4-6-0s 61138-9 worked respectively to Brighton and Eastbourne from Canonbury in June, taking over the train on reversal when it had actually left E.R. metals, from another 4-6-0 which had brought the excursion from Hitchin or Cambridge. | SLS/195209 |
24/01/1953 | Eastern Region trials | With reference to the notes on the Eastern Region trials to Doncaster and Leeds the object of these trials was not to run at high speeds, but to find sectional timings which the smaller A3 and A4 class engines, with various loads, could accomplish. A1's were therefore not used as they could easily better the times. Speed restrictions were rigidly observed, even to the extent of braking for such restrictions as Offord and Huntingdon. 60056 was equipped with a Flaman speed recorder, hence the reason for use on both G.N. and G.C. trials. Several A4's are suitably equipped so that selection was not so difficult. The cause of the up train being late on Tuesday, 6th September, was the bad forest fire near Bawtry; it was nothing to do with the engine. 61139 has been similarly equipped with a Flaman recorder and has been used on trials between Sheffield and Manchester, also Liverpool Street and Southend. With 10 coaches 61139 reached Southend, after several severe signal checks, in 51½ min., yet speed restrictions were again strictly observed. Ingrave summit was topped at about 50 m.p.h., after a severe check at Romford. | SLS/195303 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1139 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25895 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
01/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/01/1949. Dep: 02/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9685 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61139 |
||
21/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. | ||
25/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1950. Dep: 23/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28112 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1952. Dep: 18/08/1952. | ||
14/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
08/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
02/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/03/1954. Dep: 09/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28589 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1955. Dep: 16/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28755 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1958. Dep: 01/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28540 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
22/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1960. Dep: 20/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28116 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61139 from Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |