|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 13/08/1948 | 17/09/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9689 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61136 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/07/1950 | 26/07/1950 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3701 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1952 | 24/04/1952 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28188 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1953 | 10/12/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 17/03/1954 | 01/04/1954 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1956 | 23/11/1956 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28804 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/11/1958 | 16/01/1959 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28634 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 28/12/1960 | 10/02/1961 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28178 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/11/1961 | 01/12/1961 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/07/1962 | 21/08/1962 | 26 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | Queens Park Works | During March five new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1134-1138. Nos. 1134 , 1135 , 1136 , 1137 , 1138 . No. 1139 (the last of the present batch) appeared on 1/4. Works' Nos. checked are: 1134/5 (25890/91 of 1946), 1138/9 (25894/95 of 1946). | SLS/194705 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
22/10/1959 | Leicester GC MPD | Only four Bls now remain viz. 61111/36, 61376/81; others having moved to Agecroft (26B) in exchange for LM Class 5s, the latest arrivals being 44932, 45116 (still with Sc. R. numbering), 45234 an 45450. | SLS/195912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
18/03/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1136 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25892 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
16/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) | ||
13/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1948. Dep: 17/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9689 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61136 |
||
04/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/07/1950. Dep: 26/07/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3701 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1952. Dep: 24/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28188 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
04/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28150 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 10/12/1953. | ||
17/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1954. Dep: 01/04/1954. | ||
07/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. | ||
16/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1956. Dep: 23/11/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28804 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 16/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28634 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
16/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
28/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1960. Dep: 10/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28178 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/11/1961. Dep: 01/12/1961. | ||
15/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
27/07/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/07/1962. Dep: 21/08/1962. | ||
22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61136 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
22/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |