|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 05/04/1947 | 05/04/1947 | 1 day | Light Repair | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/02/1948 | 06/04/1948 | 43 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61134 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1950 | 06/04/1950 | 18 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1951 | 16/10/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/11/1953 | 28/11/1953 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/08/1954 | 18/09/1954 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/11/1956 | 22/12/1956 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/07/1958 | 16/08/1958 | 39 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/10/1959 | 20/10/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 18/11/1959 | 18/12/1959 | 31 days | Unclassified | Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/04/1960 | 21/05/1960 | 45 days | General | Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/12/1962 | 12/01/1963 | 34 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/11/1963 | 26/11/1963 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/1965 | 04/1965 | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1947 | Queens Park Works | During March five new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1134-1138. Nos. 1134 , 1135 , 1136 , 1137 , 1138 . No. 1139 (the last of the present batch) appeared on 1/4. Works' Nos. checked are: 1134/5 (25890/91 of 1946), 1138/9 (25894/95 of 1946). | SLS/194705 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Steaming Pits) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1134 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25890 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
05/04/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
24/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1948. Dep: 06/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61134 |
||
16/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
21/05/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) | ||
09/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
15/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) | ||
20/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 20/03/1950. Dep: 06/04/1950. | ||
20/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1951. Dep: 16/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
03/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/11/1953. Dep: 28/11/1953. | ||
16/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/08/1954. Dep: 18/09/1954. | ||
11/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28873 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/03/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. | ||
21/01/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 22/12/1956. | ||
09/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/07/1958. Dep: 16/08/1958. | ||
05/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/10/1959. Dep: 20/10/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
18/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/11/1959. Dep: 18/12/1959. Work undertaken: Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
07/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1960. Dep: 21/05/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28661 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/04/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
10/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/12/1962. Dep: 12/01/1963. | ||
31/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) | ||
11/03/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ayr (67C) | ||
14/11/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1963. Dep: 26/11/1963. | ||
31/07/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dalry Road (64C) | ||
04/1965 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/04/1965. Dep: ?/04/1965. | ||
05/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61134 from Dalry Road (64C) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |