28/02/1947 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1133 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25889 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
05/04/1947 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/04/1947. Dep: 05/04/1947. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted
|
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61133 |
|
|
08/09/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1948. Dep: 09/10/1948. |
|
|
09/12/1948 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 09/12/1948. Dep: 21/01/1949. |
|
|
03/02/1949 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1949. Dep: 01/03/1949. |
|
|
16/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
21/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (ABD) |
|
|
13/09/1950 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1950. Dep: 18/10/1950. |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 31/03/1951. Dep: 11/04/1951. |
|
|
20/04/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1951. Dep: 05/05/1951. |
|
|
29/06/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1951. Dep: 04/08/1951. |
|
|
19/08/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
24/10/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/10/1951. Dep: 24/10/1951. |
|
|
12/11/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 14/11/1951. |
|
|
26/11/1951 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/11/1951. Dep: 05/12/1951. |
|
|
25/01/1952 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28613 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
08/01/1953 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/01/1953. Dep: 31/01/1953. |
|
|
01/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
20/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) |
|
|
21/06/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
11/01/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. |
|
|
26/02/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/02/1954. Dep: 26/02/1954. |
|
|
03/04/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/04/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. |
|
|
02/12/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. |
|
|
29/12/1954 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1954. Dep: 29/12/1954. |
|
|
19/04/1955 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1955. Dep: 21/05/1955. |
|
|
09/04/1956 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1956. Dep: 19/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28622 (Diagram 100A)
|
|
|
16/10/1957 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/10/1957. Dep: 31/10/1957. |
|
|
31/03/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. |
|
|
30/08/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. |
|
|
25/11/1958 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/11/1958. Dep: 13/12/1958. |
|
|
24/02/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/02/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. |
|
|
30/11/1959 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/11/1959. Dep: 03/12/1959. |
|
|
16/05/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1960. Dep: 02/07/1960. |
|
|
03/09/1962 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 03/09/1962. Dep: 19/10/1962. |
|
|
14/12/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 14/12/1964. Dep: 25/01/1965. |
|
|
23/08/1965 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/08/1965. Dep: 20/09/1965. |
|
|
02/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61133 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |
|
|