|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1948 | 03/09/1948 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 9681 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61126 |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1948 | 13/10/1948 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/08/1950 | 31/08/1950 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 9947 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 24/03/1953 | 20/04/1953 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28860 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/03/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/10/1957 | 08/11/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1957 | 28/11/1957 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1958 | 17/06/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/11/1958 | 26/11/1958 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1960 | 13/09/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1126 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25882 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
19/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 03/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9681 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61126 |
||
06/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/10/1948. Dep: 13/10/1948. | ||
02/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/08/1950. Dep: 31/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9947 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 20/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28860 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1957. Dep: 08/11/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/11/1957. Dep: 28/11/1957. | ||
11/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/06/1958. Dep: 17/06/1958. | ||
22/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/11/1958. Dep: 26/11/1958. | ||
06/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1960. Dep: 13/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28503 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61126 from Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Rigleys: Bulwell Forest |