|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1948 | 09/11/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9712 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61125 |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1949 | 29/03/1949 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1950 | 13/12/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1954 | 13/05/1954 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/05/1956 | 09/06/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1957 | 09/01/1957 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/08/1958 | 05/09/1958 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28956 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/11/1960 | 14/12/1960 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28193 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1963 | 08/08/1963 | 18 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1125 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25881 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1948. Dep: 09/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9712 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61125 |
||
28/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 28/03/1949. Dep: 29/03/1949. | ||
08/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
16/07/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1950. Dep: 13/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28119 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28801 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1954. Dep: 13/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28423 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 27/09/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. | ||
08/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1956. Dep: 09/06/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28522 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/01/1957. Dep: 09/01/1957. | ||
06/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1958. Dep: 05/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28956 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/11/1960. Dep: 14/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28193 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/07/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/07/1963. Dep: 08/08/1963. | ||
28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61125 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
08/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |