|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 20/09/1948 | 13/11/1948 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9703 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61123 |
||
Gorton Works | 15/10/1950 | 09/12/1950 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28277 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/12/1950 | 18/12/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 06/06/1952 | 28/06/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 04/12/1952 | 13/12/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 10/04/1954 | 17/04/1954 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 27/11/1954 | 23/12/1954 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28134 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/01/1955 | 01/02/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/02/1955 | 01/03/1955 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 03/07/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 14/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28408 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/03/1961 | 21/04/1961 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 14/10/1964 | 21/11/1964 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 23/11/1964 | 26/11/1964 | 4 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Glasgow Area: During January ten new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123, Nos. 1118 (17/1), 1119 (20/1), 1120 (22/1), 1121 (24/1), 1122 and 1123 (30/1 or 31/1). Works Nos. checked are: 1113-1118 (25869-74/46) and 1120-1123 (25876-9/46). | SLS/194704 |
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1123 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25879 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
04/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
20/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9703 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61123 |
||
01/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
07/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
15/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/10/1950. Dep: 09/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28277 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/12/1950. Dep: 18/12/1950. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
06/06/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/06/1952. Dep: 28/06/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/12/1952. Dep: 13/12/1952. | ||
10/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/04/1954. Dep: 17/04/1954. | ||
27/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1954. Dep: 23/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28134 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1955. Dep: 01/02/1955. | ||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 01/03/1955. | ||
03/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/07/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957. | ||
14/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28408 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1961. Dep: 21/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28424 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
14/10/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1964. Dep: 21/11/1964. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/11/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/11/1964. Dep: 26/11/1964. | ||
22/01/1967 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
11/05/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61123 from York (North) (50A) | ||
21/07/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |