|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 08/03/1948 | 14/04/1948 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 9676 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61122 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1950 | 24/08/1950 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9683 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/08/1950 | 01/09/1950 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 29/08/1952 | 20/09/1952 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 28446 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/12/1954 | 06/01/1955 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/01/1957 | 15/02/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1958 | 24/01/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28872 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/04/1961 | 02/06/1961 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Glasgow Area: During January ten new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123, Nos. 1118 (17/1), 1119 (20/1), 1120 (22/1), 1121 (24/1), 1122 and 1123 (30/1 or 31/1). Works Nos. checked are: 1113-1118 (25869-74/46) and 1120-1123 (25876-9/46). | SLS/194704 |
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
04/01/1959 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop-60162 (64B), 60003 (34A), 60035 (64B), 60017 (34A), 60145 (52A), 60103 (34A), 62030 (52C), 73000 (41B), 73155 (41C), 61122 (36A), 61971 (32A), 61889 (31B), 61820 (30F), 61890 (31B), 68987 (34B), 61162 (36A), 61846 (53A), 61409 (40B), 60001 (52A), 61158 (36A), 60526/502 (50A), 60039 (34A), 60152 (64B), 60026 (34A), 60520 (34F). Paint Shop-D3321 (52B), D3148 (51L), D5308 (34B), D6101/2 (34B), 60117 (56C), 61925 (36A), 60160 (64B), 62032 (31B). Yard-70030 (32A), 68914 (56B), 73016 (41C), 63940 (34F), D3079 (53A), 60508 (34E), 11182 (40A), 63975 (36A), 60063 (34F), 60095 (12C), 61816 (31B), 61406 (40B). Diesel Shop-E5001/2 motors in, D2050/1 motors in, 11106 (51C), 13147/51 (51L). Withdrawn-64216/7, 61606/48/22, 69493, 67397, 69544, 64201/74/6, 69551, 69593, 64205/49, 64183. | SLS/195902 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1122 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25878 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
04/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
08/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1948. Dep: 14/04/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9676 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61122 |
||
09/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 09/03/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. | ||
08/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | |||
20/07/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1950. Dep: 24/08/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9683 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/08/1950. Dep: 01/09/1950. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
29/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1952. Dep: 20/09/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28446 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
01/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/12/1954. Dep: 06/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28348 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
23/10/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/01/1957. Dep: 15/02/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28861 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1958. Dep: 24/01/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28872 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1961. Dep: 02/06/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28157 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61122 from New England (34E) | ||
30/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |