|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1948 | 04/11/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 5089 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61121 |
||
Stratford Works | 14/08/1950 | 23/09/1950 | 41 days | General | MV lighting removed Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 28/03/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1953 | 03/07/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 02/09/1953 | 03/10/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/09/1954 | 17/09/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 15/02/1955 | 24/06/1955 | 130 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1955 | 07/01/1956 | 34 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/04/1956 | 11/05/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 25/11/1957 | 20/12/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/08/1958 | 03/09/1958 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/07/1960 | 27/08/1960 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/02/1961 | 18/02/1961 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/04/1963 | 19/06/1963 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Glasgow Area: During January ten new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123, Nos. 1118 (17/1), 1119 (20/1), 1120 (22/1), 1121 (24/1), 1122 and 1123 (30/1 or 31/1). Works Nos. checked are: 1113-1118 (25869-74/46) and 1120-1123 (25876-9/46). | SLS/194704 |
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1121 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25877 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1948. Dep: 04/11/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5089 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61121 |
||
12/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
20/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
22/10/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
26/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
14/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1950. Dep: 23/09/1950. Work undertaken: MV lighting removed Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28585 (Diagram 100A) |
||
01/07/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/07/1953. Dep: 03/07/1953. | ||
02/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1953. Dep: 03/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28538 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/09/1954. Dep: 17/09/1954. | ||
15/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 15/02/1955. Dep: 24/06/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28264 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1955. Dep: 07/01/1956. | ||
19/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/04/1956. Dep: 11/05/1956. | ||
28/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
25/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1957. Dep: 20/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28149 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/08/1958. Dep: 03/09/1958. | ||
25/01/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
08/02/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1960. Dep: 27/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28120 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/02/1961. Dep: 18/02/1961. | ||
25/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1963. Dep: 19/06/1963. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28803 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61121 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |