|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 14/10/1948 | 04/12/1948 | 52 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61119 |
||
Stratford Works | 29/03/1949 | 01/04/1949 | 4 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 29/06/1949 | 26/07/1949 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/04/1950 | 27/05/1950 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 9751 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 04/04/1952 | 30/05/1952 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/10/1952 | 25/10/1952 | 12 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 26/07/1954 | 11/09/1954 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 23/07/1956 | 25/08/1956 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28848 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 02/12/1957 | 07/12/1957 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 18/06/1958 | 20/06/1958 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 22/01/1959 | 13/03/1959 | 51 days | General | Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 18/12/1959 | 29/01/1960 | 43 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1960 | 21/09/1960 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/07/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1962 | 20/06/1962 | 29 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/01/1947 | General | Glasgow Area: During January ten new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123, Nos. 1118 (17/1), 1119 (20/1), 1120 (22/1), 1121 (24/1), 1122 and 1123 (30/1 or 31/1). Works Nos. checked are: 1113-1118 (25869-74/46) and 1120-1123 (25876-9/46). | SLS/194704 |
28/02/1947 | Queens Park Works | During January ten new Class 'B.1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1114-1123 inclusive; whilst during February a further ten appeared, viz., Nos. 1124-1133 inclusive. Works Nos. checked are as follows:, 1114-1118 (25870-4/46), 1120-1123 (25876-9/46), 1125-1133 (25881-9/46). | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/01/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1119 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25875 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
14/10/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1948. Dep: 04/12/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61119 |
||
29/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/03/1949. Dep: 01/04/1949. | ||
29/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/06/1949. Dep: 26/07/1949. | ||
27/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/04/1950. Dep: 27/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9751 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1952. Dep: 30/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28502 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/10/1952. Dep: 25/10/1952. | ||
26/07/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/07/1954. Dep: 11/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28101 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1956. Dep: 25/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28848 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/12/1957. Dep: 07/12/1957. | ||
18/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1958. Dep: 20/06/1958. | ||
22/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1959. Dep: 13/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28161 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
24/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) | ||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
18/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 18/12/1959. Dep: 29/01/1960. | ||
16/09/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/09/1960. Dep: 21/09/1960. | ||
19/07/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28835 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/05/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/05/1962. Dep: 20/06/1962. | ||
16/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
25/11/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61119 from March (31B) | ||
14/01/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |