|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 13/07/1947 | 07/10/1947 | 87 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1948 | 31/12/1948 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9832 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61110 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/02/1951 | 14/04/1951 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/03/1953 | 11/04/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/04/1953 | 14/04/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 20/09/1955 | 14/10/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/05/1957 | 22/06/1957 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/06/1958 | 01/07/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28237 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 06/10/1961 | 02/11/1961 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 14/11/1961 | 24/11/1961 | 11 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
11/10/1955 | York (York shed) | An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). | SLS/195512 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1110 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25866 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
01/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
13/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/07/1947. Dep: 07/10/1947. | ||
10/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1948. Dep: 31/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9832 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61110 |
||
22/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1951. Dep: 14/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
25/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
09/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
16/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1953. Dep: 11/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28319 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/04/1953. Dep: 14/04/1953. | ||
20/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1955. Dep: 14/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/05/1957. Dep: 22/06/1957. | ||
04/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1958. Dep: 01/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28237 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1961. Dep: 02/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28133 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/11/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/11/1961. Dep: 24/11/1961. | ||
31/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61110 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |