|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1948 | 30/01/1948 | 11 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/09/1948 | 28/10/1948 | 48 days | General | Boiler number 9708 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61107 |
||
Gorton Works | 10/12/1948 | 23/12/1948 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/10/1950 | 26/10/1950 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1950 | 18/12/1950 | 37 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/09/1952 | 17/10/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1953 | 26/01/1953 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/12/1954 | 05/01/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1955 | 31/01/1955 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 01/03/1957 | 28/03/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1959 | 13/06/1959 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1960 | 01/09/1960 | 22 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/10/1961 | 07/12/1961 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 28327 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Crimpsal) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
03/12/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3474/7, E3070-6. Stripping Road: 60027, 60138, 63938, 73003. Scrap Road: Nil. Crimpsal: 60157, 61317, 70049, 73035. Outside Crimpsal: 60007, 60103. Boiler Park: 60048, 60109/51. Erecting Shop: D2026, D3153, D3325, D3451/74, D3646 D5520/68/9, D5612/3, D8215, 60029/71, 60149/60, 60523, 61286, 62048,, 63931/56/73, 70008/36/44, 73000/24. Outside Erecting Shop: 60148, 62034. Weigh House: D3478, D5050. Outside Weigh House: 60023, 61042. Paint Shop: D369, D5363, D5825, D9001/18, E3069, 60046, 61107, 63960/81/7, 73054. Paint Shop Yard: Nil. Works Shunters: DEPT. 10/1. | SLS/196201 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
10/10/1965 | Doncaster Shed (Stored) | Stationary boiler: 92190. Stored: 61107/96, 61208, 61367, 63593, 63688, 63738, 90085/96/195/235/52/93/349/64/5/454/76/557/687. | SLS/196511 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
13/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1107 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25861 Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
20/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/01/1948. Dep: 30/01/1948. | ||
11/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/09/1948. Dep: 28/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9708 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61107 |
||
14/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
20/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
10/12/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 10/12/1948. Dep: 23/12/1948. | ||
27/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
13/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
19/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
07/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
02/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1950. Dep: 26/10/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28108 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/11/1950. Dep: 18/12/1950. | ||
30/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
06/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
11/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
17/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
22/09/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1952. Dep: 17/10/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 26/01/1953. Dep: 26/01/1953. | ||
06/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/12/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28752 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Weighing) - Arr: 30/01/1955. Dep: 31/01/1955. | ||
01/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1957. Dep: 28/03/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28282 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1959. Dep: 13/06/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28531 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1960. Dep: 01/09/1960. | ||
20/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/10/1961. Dep: 07/12/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28327 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/04/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
15/08/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61107 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |