|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/05/1949 | 05/07/1949 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 9753 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61105 |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1951 | 01/05/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28139 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/04/1953 | 18/05/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/05/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/08/1953 | 27/08/1953 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/02/1955 | 25/02/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1956 | 02/11/1956 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/09/1957 | 24/10/1957 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28756 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1958 | 15/01/1959 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/11/1959 | 11/12/1959 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/12/1959 | 30/12/1959 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/10/1960 | 19/10/1960 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1962 | 29/11/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Kingmoor MPD | In steam at Kingmoor on 17th March were 46223/6/44/55. Stored on same day at Kingmoor were-42320, 42830/4/7/75/82-4/99, 42906, 44341, 45640/80,18, 46124/200/1, 47211/81, 47342/58, 47481, 58160 an 90763. | SLS/196304 |
11/04/1963 | Derby Works | Erecting Shop- No. 1 bay: 41535, 43915 being cut up, 47276, 48274, 73086/91, 75059, D2220, D2913, D3020, D3178, ED6/7; Erecting Shop- No. 2 bay: D73, D123 an D5093; Erecting Shop- No. 3 bay: D5203-5215 new construction. Diesel Erecting Shop: D33, D42, D78, D82/3, D90/2, D127. Diesel Finishing Shop: D4, D40, D5200-2 under construction. Paint Shop: D5196/7. Test House: D55, D64, D109, D140, D5082, D5191, D5198/9. Yard (by paint shop): 40157, 42146 an 42585 broken up; 47003 frames; D7, D61, D126, D149, D152, D2236, D5010/20/76/82/90/1, D5143/92/4/5. Foundry Sdg.: 40022, 42302/29/91, 42472, 42500, 44100, D2911. Stone Pit: 44268, 73021. | SLS/196304 |
27/04/1963 | Birmingham Excursions | On Saturday, 27th April, fifteen excursions were run from Southampton area for the football match at Villa Park; ten travelled via Basingstoke, Oxford and Leamington utilising 34028/40/2/5/50/2/88/94/8 whilst 7919(81D) had taken over from a failed Wset Country in the Reading area. Three travelled by same route to Oxford thence Worcester and Stourbridge Junc. being piloted therefrom by LMR 8Fs, the pilots working through to Snow Hill instead of being detached at Oldbury after climbing Old Hill bank-viz. 34009/48417, 34039/48478 and 34046/48430; the remaining two arrived at New St. behind Bristol jubilees 45682/90, one having travelled via the SDJR and the other via Salisbury. On same date, B1 61105(41A) worked a Manchester-Stratford-on-Avon special but was replaced on return working by Hall 6948 after 'failing' at Tyseley; it was used by latter shed during the next week on local turns. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1105 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25858 Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1949. Dep: 05/07/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9753 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61105 |
||
29/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 01/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28139 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
23/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1953. Dep: 18/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28140 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 26/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
05/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1953. Dep: 27/08/1953. | ||
01/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1955. Dep: 25/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28508 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/10/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/10/1956. Dep: 02/11/1956. | ||
25/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1957. Dep: 24/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28756 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
16/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1958. Dep: 15/01/1959. | ||
10/11/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1959. Dep: 11/12/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28189 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/12/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/12/1959. Dep: 30/12/1959. | ||
03/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/10/1960. Dep: 19/10/1960. | ||
24/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1962. Dep: 29/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28121 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
10/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61105 from New England (34E) | ||
08/03/1965 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 27 | ||
07/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by R A Kings: Norwich |