|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 27/07/1948 | 27/08/1948 | 32 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61103 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/04/1950 | 06/05/1950 | 20 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/03/1952 | 03/05/1952 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28604 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/11/1953 | 12/12/1953 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
29/06/1954 | 03/07/1954 | 5 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 29/11/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 27 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/04/1955 | 06/05/1955 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/10/1955 | 29/10/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28666 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/08/1956 | 27/08/1956 | 13 days | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1957 | 30/08/1957 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1959 | 27/08/1959 | 25 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1960 | 03/12/1960 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28667 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Inverurie Works | 28/05/1963 | 12/07/1963 | 46 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | During December twelve new Class 'B1' engines appeared ex Q.P. Works, Nos. 1102-1113 inclusive (74 in 8&nfrac12; months), No. 1111 being the N.B. Loco. Co.'s 'Christmas present' to the L.N.E.R.-it was ex Works on 25.12.46! No. 1112 was ex Works 27.12.46, and 1113 on either Mon-day 30th or Tuesday 31st, before the Works closed down for the New Year holidays. 1111 ran trials on 28/12, and on 4/1/47 was observed working the 2.25 p.m. Glasgow-Edinburgh train. Works Nos. checked are as follows: 1106 (25859/46), 1107 (26861/46), 1109 (25865/46), 1110 (25866/46), 1111 (25867/46), 1112 (25868/46). It will be noted there is further confusion. On 23/12 1114 was noted in Q.P. Works Erecting Shop with Works plates 25870/46, although 1113 had no plates fitted. The Maker's plates are not usually fitted until the engine is in the Paint Shop. On the above date up to 1116 (which only lacked wheels), were noted in the Works. 1111 and 1112 were in the Paint Shop. No. 6399 'D.11' 'Allan-Bane' was noted at Eastfleld on 2/1/47 still un-Renumbered. This must be one of the very few not yet renumbered in Scotland. The last one noted was 'J6' 9668 in Cowlairs Works Yard on 7/12/46, and 'V.2' 4819 on the same day. 9668 has since appeared as 5240. | SLS/194702 |
22/08/1948 | Eastfleld MPD | Class 'Q.1' NO,. 9927 has been re-numbered 69927 and lettered British Railways, but retains the L.N.E.R. totem on the bunker. Another engine of this Class, No. 9925, has been fitted with slip-coupling apparatus since early July and was used on the Cowlairs Bank during the Glasgow Fair Holiday. No. 61103 (THJ) was noted here painted black and fully lined on 28/8 being ex Cowlairs W/E 28/8; a smokebox numberplate had been fitted | SLS/194810 |
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (In Works) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/12/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1103 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25863 Allocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1948. Dep: 27/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61103 |
||
17/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 17/04/1950. Dep: 06/05/1950. | ||
19/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1952. Dep: 03/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28604 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/11/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 16/11/1953. Dep: 12/12/1953. | ||
29/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954. | ||
25/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/04/1955. Dep: 06/05/1955. | ||
03/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1955. Dep: 29/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28666 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/07/1957. Dep: 30/08/1957. | ||
23/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. | ||
03/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/08/1959. Dep: 27/08/1959. | ||
08/11/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/11/1960. Dep: 03/12/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28667 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 28/05/1963. Dep: 12/07/1963. | ||
14/07/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61103 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
09/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |