|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 25/05/1948 | 26/06/1948 | 33 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61101 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/05/1950 | 16/06/1950 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/03/1952 | 15/04/1952 | 44 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/02/1954 | 06/03/1954 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 25/08/1954 | 31/08/1954 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/03/1955 | 19/03/1955 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1955 | 24/09/1955 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/11/1955 | 17/12/1955 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/07/1957 | 10/08/1957 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1958 | 07/06/1958 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/05/1959 | 03/06/1959 | 20 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/12/1960 | 30/12/1960 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/06/1961 | 19/08/1961 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28633 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1963 | 23/11/1963 | 66 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/02/1966 | 10/02/1966 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1966 | 12/03/1966 | 6 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Paint Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
06/07/1961 | Cowlairs Works (Waiting Works) | Stripping Shop: 61342, 65902. Erecting Shop: 11713, 61132/97, 64864, 65903, 72005/9, 73078, 73120/51, 76097, 80124, 90097, GNS49. Works Yard: D2584, 72006. Works Shunters: D3393, 65228. Scrap Road: 40627, 56308, 64523, 64892, 67612. Waiting Works: 61101, 61341, 65915, 90542, 90753.Ex-Works : 90640. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
28/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1101 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25857 Allocated to Dundee Tay Bridge (DEE) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
25/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1948. Dep: 26/06/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61101 |
||
26/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 26/05/1950. Dep: 16/06/1950. | ||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 15/04/1952. | ||
01/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/02/1954. Dep: 06/03/1954. | ||
25/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/08/1954. Dep: 31/08/1954. | ||
08/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/03/1955. Dep: 19/03/1955. | ||
09/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/09/1955. Dep: 24/09/1955. | ||
10/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1955. Dep: 17/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28626 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/07/1957. Dep: 10/08/1957. | ||
14/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 14/05/1958. Dep: 07/06/1958. | ||
15/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/05/1959. Dep: 03/06/1959. | ||
20/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/12/1960. Dep: 30/12/1960. | ||
21/06/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1961. Dep: 19/08/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28633 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/09/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1963. Dep: 23/11/1963. | ||
02/02/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/02/1966. Dep: 10/02/1966. | ||
07/03/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/03/1966. Dep: 12/03/1966. | ||
31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61101 | ||
27/02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |