|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1949 | 07/04/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9687 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61099 |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/04/1951 | 07/05/1951 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28141 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/02/1953 | 12/03/1953 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28207 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/05/1953 | 19/05/1953 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/06/1954 | 01/07/1954 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/11/1954 | 04/12/1954 | 26 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/12/1955 | 14/01/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28639 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/12/1957 | 16/01/1958 | 24 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1959 | 15/04/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 27 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 16/02/1961 | 15/04/1961 | 59 days | General | Boiler number 28609 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1962 | 03/03/1962 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/04/1963 | 08/06/1963 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/04/1964 | 01/05/1964 | 14 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/02/1966 | 19/02/1966 | 17 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/03/1966 | 26/03/1966 | 10 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
21/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1099 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25855 Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
06/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1949. Dep: 07/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9687 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61099 |
||
10/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1951. Dep: 07/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28141 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) | ||
14/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1953. Dep: 12/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28207 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1953. Dep: 19/05/1953. | ||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
18/06/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/06/1954. Dep: 01/07/1954. | ||
09/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/11/1954. Dep: 04/12/1954. | ||
23/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/12/1955. Dep: 14/01/1956. | ||
12/08/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28639 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/12/1957. Dep: 16/01/1958. | ||
31/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/03/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959. | ||
10/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. | ||
16/02/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1961. Dep: 15/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28609 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/02/1962. Dep: 03/03/1962. | ||
30/04/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/04/1963. Dep: 08/06/1963. | ||
18/04/1964 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/04/1964. Dep: 01/05/1964. | ||
09/01/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bathgate (64F) | ||
03/02/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/02/1966. Dep: 19/02/1966. | ||
17/03/1966 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/03/1966. Dep: 26/03/1966. | ||
24/04/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
02/09/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61099 from Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
10/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |