|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/11/1948 | 15/01/1949 | 49 days | General | Boiler number 9731 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61096 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/02/1951 | 09/03/1951 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28130 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/04/1953 | 29/05/1953 | 32 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1955 | 16/03/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28115 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 21/03/1955 | 29/03/1955 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 02/04/1955 | 03/04/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1956 | 09/01/1957 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/02/1957 | 08/03/1957 | 24 days | Light Casual | After collision |
||
Stratford Works | 11/11/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 41 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 20/01/1959 | 06/03/1959 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 13/03/1959 | 16/03/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1960 | 21/07/1960 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/01/1961 | 22/02/1961 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/12/1946 | Queens Park Works | A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading | SLS/194701 |
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
01/02/1960 | Peterborough Midland Closure | Peterborough Midland (31F) closed as from 1st February and the engines were transferred as follows-to March D2239, 11156/7, 41949, 44152/273, 44509/21, 47300, 61095/6, 61156/204/5/323/48, 62613, 64789, 64901, 90063/447/501/28. To New England (34E) 43127; Grimesthorpe (41B) 44097/518; remainder returned to LMR viz. 43957, 44110/239/47/476/519/22. | SLS/196003 |
19/02/1961 | Doncaster Works (Paint Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3063, D2385-9, E3056-61. New Erecting Shop Yard: E3062. Scrap Road: DEPT2, DEPT9, 61766, 64231, 68623, 68875, 68930/47/79, 69574. Stripping Road: D3452/85, 60010/23/92, 60118/36/40, 60529, 61950, 63943, 64878/85, 68943, 76032. Erecting Shop: D2233, D2402, D3165, D3575, D3630, D8210, 43081, 60030/1/68, 60103/10/29/39, 60521, 61138, 61254, 61313/8, 61807, 61901/13/61, 62032/50, 63926/86, 73001. Outside Erecting Shop: 60021/41, 61150, 61234, 61926, 63964, 73096. Crimpsall: 60133, 62039. Paint Shop: D318/33, D5686/7, D6708/9, D8046, 43152, 60514/34, 61096, 70054. Outside Paint Shop: 60124, 60522, 61165, 61954. Works Shunters: DEPT10 (ex-68911), DEPT11 (ex-68914), 68977. | SLS/196104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1096 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25852 Allocated to Hitchin (GNR) (HIT ) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
19/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
31/10/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
06/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1948. Dep: 15/01/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9731 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61096 |
||
17/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
07/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
13/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
04/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
07/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1951. Dep: 09/03/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28130 (Diagram 100A) |
||
23/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
29/12/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
28/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28394 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/04/1953. Dep: 29/05/1953. | ||
17/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 16/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28115 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/03/1955. Dep: 29/03/1955. | ||
02/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/04/1955. Dep: 03/04/1955. | ||
12/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1956. Dep: 09/01/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28420 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/02/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/02/1957. Dep: 08/03/1957. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
11/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/11/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
21/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
14/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Spital Bridge (31F) | ||
20/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1959. Dep: 06/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28557 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/03/1959. Dep: 16/03/1959. | ||
31/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
13/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/07/1960. Dep: 21/07/1960. | ||
20/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1961. Dep: 22/02/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28276 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61096 from March (31B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |