|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 26/01/1949 | 01/03/1949 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 9755 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61093 |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/07/1949 | 18/08/1949 | 30 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1951 | 06/02/1951 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1952 | 16/01/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1954 | 03/11/1954 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1955 | 01/02/1955 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1956 | 08/12/1956 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28344 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/05/1958 | 08/07/1958 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/12/1960 | 26/01/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
31/12/1961 | Millhouses closure | Millhouses M.P.D. (41C) was closed as from 31/12/61 and its allocation of locomotives distributed as follows : 41209/45/6, 43037, 45570/6/90/4, 45602/7/27/54/6/64/83/725, 45536, 46131/47/8/51/4, 46450, 61083/93, 61820/2, 73016/65/155 all to Canklow (41D); 78022/3/4/5 to Doncaster (36A). | SLS/196203 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/11/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1093 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25849 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
26/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1949. Dep: 01/03/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9755 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61093 |
||
20/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/07/1949. Dep: 18/08/1949. | ||
16/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1951. Dep: 06/02/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28127 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1952. Dep: 16/01/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28300 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/10/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1954. Dep: 03/11/1954. | ||
25/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/01/1955. Dep: 01/02/1955. | ||
06/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1956. Dep: 08/12/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28344 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/05/1958. Dep: 08/07/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28814 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (41F) | ||
29/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/12/1960. Dep: 26/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28413 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/12/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
28/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
25/07/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61093 from Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
09/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cohens: Ickles |