|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/09/1948 | 27/10/1948 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 9700 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61092 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/11/1949 | 28/01/1950 | 62 days | General | Boiler number 9860 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1950 | 02/02/1950 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 05/02/1950 | 10/02/1950 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1951 | 03/11/1951 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 08/09/1955 | 05/10/1955 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/04/1956 | 20/04/1956 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/05/1957 | 16/05/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 01/10/1957 | 26/10/1957 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28294 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/07/1959 | 05/08/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28958 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/01/1960 | 30/01/1960 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/10/1960 | 04/11/1960 | 24 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/02/1962 | 04/04/1962 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
01/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives under repair here on 1/10 included Nos. 8, 37, 87, 98, 516/19, 1092, 1107/09/12/24, 60007/18/19/20/60, 60635 an 61120. | SLS/194811 |
08/10/1948 | Doncaster Works | Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. | SLS/194812 |
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
30/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1092 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25848 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1948. Dep: 27/10/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9700 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61092 |
||
22/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
28/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1949. Dep: 28/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9860 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 31/01/1950. Dep: 02/02/1950. | ||
05/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/02/1950. Dep: 10/02/1950. | ||
12/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
18/03/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
28/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1951. Dep: 03/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28232 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28575 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
08/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/09/1955. Dep: 05/10/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28211 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/04/1956. Dep: 20/04/1956. | ||
14/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 14/05/1957. Dep: 16/05/1957. | ||
01/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1957. Dep: 26/10/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28294 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/07/1959. Dep: 05/08/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28958 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/01/1960. Dep: 30/01/1960. | ||
12/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1960. Dep: 04/11/1960. | ||
27/02/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1962. Dep: 04/04/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61092 from Colwick (16B) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Birds: Long Marston |