|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 47 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61089 |
||
Gorton Works | 07/06/1949 | 11/06/1949 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 16/01/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 76 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 03/07/1951 | 11/08/1951 | 40 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 17/03/1952 | 19/04/1952 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/01/1954 | 06/02/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1955 | 12/05/1955 | 71 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/03/1956 | 14/05/1956 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 12/11/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1958 | 23/05/1958 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 15/12/1958 | 06/02/1959 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 16/02/1959 | 19/02/1959 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 11/03/1959 | 12/03/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 27/04/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 19 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/10/1961 | 10/11/1961 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28872 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/04/1962 | 17/05/1962 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/12/1962 | 09/01/1963 | 24 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1946 | General | New 'B.1' 4-6-0's, Nos. 1089-99, etc. (from 1094 they are green), are much in evidence on outer suburban, Hitchin' etc., workings at King's Cross. Scottish visitors seen there before Christmas were: Blue 'A.4' 4, William Whitelaw, and 'V.2' 834 (late 4805), both of Haymarket. Gateshead or Heaton 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' often get through to London. N.E., G.C., and G.E. locos. still appear from time to time on G.N. freight, parcel or similar trains. The G.E. principal express workings to Liverpool Street (including the East Anglian) from Norwich are regularly operated by the new standard 2-cyl. 4-6-0's, with drivers keeping their own loco. as far as possible. These excellent engines are on other G.E. as well as G.C. fast passenger turns also. | SLS/194702 |
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
31/12/1958 | Stratford Works (Old Works) | Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. | SLS/195902 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) | New Erecting Shop: D3254, E3069-74. Stripping Road: D5802, 43151, 60003, 60108, 63936/60/81, 73000. Crimpsal: 60046, 60127. Outside Crimpsal: 61107, 63969, 70008/44. Scrap Yard: 60055, 61866, 64646, 65450/78 intact, 61979 being cut up. Boiler Park: 60025, 63980. Erecting Shop: D2021, D3153, D3447/8/76-8, D3646, D5520/83, D5600/6/9/66, D5805, D9004, 13166, 60021/65/89, 60162, 60525/38, 61003/89, 61143/62, 61389, 63927/73, 70000/13. Weigh House: D9016. Outside Weigh House: 60071/80. Paint Shop: D364, D5050/4, D5358, D5820, E3067/8, 43159, 61207, 61367. Paint Shop Yard : Nil. Works Shunters: Dpt10/1. | SLS/196112 |
12/11/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on Shed) | Ex-Works on Shed: 43159, 60089, 61089. D5821. | SLS/196112 |
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
03/01/1966 | Colwick MPD | Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. | SLS/196603 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1089 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25845 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
03/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61089 |
||
26/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/01/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
07/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/06/1949. Dep: 11/06/1949. | ||
28/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
03/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
16/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. | ||
27/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
02/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
24/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
03/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/07/1951. Dep: 11/08/1951. | ||
17/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1952. Dep: 19/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28584 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1954. Dep: 06/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28570 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/03/1955. Dep: 12/05/1955. | ||
23/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1956. Dep: 14/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28572 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. | ||
06/01/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
29/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
19/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/05/1958. Dep: 23/05/1958. | ||
15/12/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1958. Dep: 06/02/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) BTH speed indicator fitted |
||
16/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/02/1959. Dep: 19/02/1959. | ||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 12/03/1959. | ||
27/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
27/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
11/10/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1961. Dep: 10/11/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28872 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/04/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 30/04/1962. Dep: 17/05/1962. | ||
17/12/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1962. Dep: 09/01/1963. | ||
22/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
02/04/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61089 from Colwick (16B) | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |