|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/10/1947 | 06/12/1947 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 07/12/1947 | 18/12/1947 | 12 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1949 | 03/09/1949 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9702 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61082 |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1950 | 22/04/1950 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28357 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1952 | 12/01/1952 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 15/01/1952 | 17/01/1952 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/08/1952 | 29/08/1952 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/10/1952 | 03/11/1952 | 29 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 21/09/1953 | 20/10/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/12/1954 | 05/01/1955 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/02/1955 | 12/03/1955 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/09/1956 | 13/10/1956 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/09/1958 | 17/10/1958 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28231 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/01/1959 | 27/01/1959 | 15 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/05/1960 | 07/07/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/10/1961 | 30/10/1961 | 26 days | C/1-1 | Boiler number 28807 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/10/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1082 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25839 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
17/05/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 06/12/1947. | ||
07/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 07/12/1947. Dep: 18/12/1947. | ||
06/08/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1949. Dep: 03/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9702 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61082 |
||
25/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 25/03/1950. Dep: 22/04/1950. | ||
13/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28357 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/01/1952. Dep: 12/01/1952. | ||
15/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/01/1952. Dep: 17/01/1952. | ||
11/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/08/1952. Dep: 29/08/1952. | ||
06/10/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1952. Dep: 03/11/1952. | ||
21/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1953. Dep: 20/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28331 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/12/1954. Dep: 05/01/1955. | ||
10/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1955. Dep: 12/03/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28144 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1956. Dep: 13/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28506 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1958. Dep: 17/10/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28231 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/01/1959. Dep: 27/01/1959. | ||
31/05/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1960. Dep: 07/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/10/1961 | Works Visit | |||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61082 from Immingham (40B) | ||
02/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |