|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/04/1948 | 22/05/1948 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 9710 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61078 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1950 | 01/04/1950 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 9965 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1951 | 08/12/1951 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28364 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1951 | 19/12/1951 | 9 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1953 | 13/06/1953 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/06/1953 | 22/06/1953 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/01/1955 | 05/02/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/02/1956 | 01/03/1956 | 11 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1956 | 18/10/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/12/1957 | 20/01/1958 | 33 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 31/10/1958 | 03/12/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1960 | 16/09/1960 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/08/1962 | 20/09/1962 | 28 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/02/1955 | York Station | 44927 (24E) visited York on 2nd February with an excursion from Blackpool. On the following day 43051 (51D) was at York en route for Doncaster Works, and on 8th February 67748 (34E) was at York bound for Darlington Works with 67720 (34A) proceeding south again after overhaul at Darlington. On 10th February 61078 (38E) was at York returning to the GC section after repair at Darlington and 61141 (38C) arrived in similar circumstances on 12th February. Other unusual visitors to York on 12th February were 78022 on the 9.40 a.m. Sheffield to York (S.O.) and the 1.0 p.m. York to Sheffield (S.O.), 48252 (5B), and 68429 (50C) presumed returning to Selby again after a period of loan to Sunderland. In the northbound direction were 61744 (40F) and 61757 (40F), heading for Cowlairs Works and 90550 (31B) for repair at Darlington. | SLS/195504 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
23/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1078 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25834 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
12/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/04/1948. Dep: 22/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9710 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61078 |
||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
11/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1950. Dep: 01/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9965 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1951. Dep: 08/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28364 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/12/1951. Dep: 19/12/1951. | ||
27/01/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
23/02/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
11/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
17/05/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (38E) | ||
13/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1953. Dep: 13/06/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28202 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/06/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/06/1953. Dep: 22/06/1953. | ||
10/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1955. Dep: 05/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28270 (Diagram 100A) |
||
20/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/02/1956. Dep: 01/03/1956. | ||
21/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1956. Dep: 18/10/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28117 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 19/12/1957. Dep: 20/01/1958. | ||
31/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/10/1958. Dep: 03/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28406 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1960. Dep: 16/09/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28560 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/08/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/08/1962. Dep: 20/09/1962. | ||
08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61078 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
22/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |