|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 26/01/1948 | 26/03/1948 | 61 days | General | Renumbered to BR 61076 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 13/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 03/09/1951 | 30/10/1951 | 58 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1953 | 05/12/1953 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | Front end heater connection fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/05/1954 | 11/06/1954 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/10/1955 | 12/11/1955 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 28667 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 29/03/1958 | 26/04/1958 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/01/1959 | 13/02/1959 | 17 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1960 | 06/08/1960 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28646 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Inverurie Works | 04/06/1963 | 19/07/1963 | 46 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
27/01/1963 | Berkeley Road | Berkeley Road south curve (ex-GWR) was permanently closed w.e.f. 27th January, 1963, after being disused since the Severn Bridge disaster. | SLS/196304 |
04/03/1963 | Northallerton & Blaydon MPD | Northallerton shed (51J) closed on 4th March and its duties and engines (62003/44, 78011/2/4/5) were transferred to Darlington. From 4th March too, Blaydon lost its steam allocation and is now a sub-shed of Gateshead (52A), all its work being taken over by Type 3 diesels which are all treble-shifted. It is expected that Scarborough (50E), Malton (50F) and Heaton (52B) are to be closed with the Summer tt. upon the arrival of further diesels. | SLS/196304 |
06/05/1963 | Scottish Region | Steam made a rare appearance on the GNS on Monday, 6th May, when a B1 and a standard 4 took from Aberdeen a special train to Lossiemouth from Crewe. Recently this train has run via Dava and the Highland main line. On 19th April the 1-15 p.m. special from Aberdeen to Glasgow was hauled from Perth by Clan Mackenzie. On the 20th April, the 10-03 a.m. ex Waverley to Perth was double-headed by 61076 an 45433. | SLS/196304 |
12/06/1963 | Inverurie Works (In Works) | In Works: 42273, 45176, 61076, 61103, D8032. Shopped in four weeks ending 7th June : 64588, D362, D6155, 44960, 65930, 61404. Scrapped in same period: 64581, 65217/57/304, 64822, 65928; 64499, 65237. Being scrapped: 57617/31, 68346, 90077/575. Awaiting scrapping or shopping-64599/600, 64795, 64950/86. 64946 was waiting at Kittybrewster. | SLS/196307 |
20/07/1963 | Inverurie Works (Shopped) | Shopped during six weeks ended 20th July: 42273, 45176, 61076/346/402, 64549, 65267/323/908/22/6, D5340, D6140/5/6. Scrapped in same period-57607, 64795/946/86, 65261, 67668, 68445/79. | SLS/196309 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/09/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1076 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25832 Allocated to Haymarket (HAY) |
||
26/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1948. Dep: 26/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61076 |
||
13/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 13/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. | ||
03/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1951. Dep: 30/10/1951. | ||
26/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/10/1953. Dep: 05/12/1953. Work undertaken: Front end heater connection fitted |
||
12/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/05/1954. Dep: 11/06/1954. | ||
01/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1955. Dep: 12/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28667 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 29/03/1958. Dep: 26/04/1958. | ||
28/01/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/01/1959. Dep: 13/02/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
08/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1960. Dep: 06/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28646 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
23/09/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
04/06/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/06/1963. Dep: 19/07/1963. | ||
10/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61076 from St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Shipbreaking Industries: Faslane |