|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Inverurie Works | 04/09/1946 | 04/09/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 10/09/1946 | 10/09/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 17/10/1946 | 17/10/1946 | 1 day | Unclassified | |||
Inverurie Works | 05/02/1947 | 08/02/1947 | 4 days | Light Repair | Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/01/1948 | 13/03/1948 | 55 days | General | Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1064 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/02/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/10/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 25 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/02/1953 | 05/03/1953 | 22 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/04/1954 | 31/05/1954 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | After collision with 62012 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 28/06/1955 | 06/08/1955 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 28878 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/06/1957 | 12/07/1957 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/02/1959 | 11/03/1959 | 29 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/08/1960 | 07/10/1960 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28622 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
17/03/1963 | Carlisle Canal MPD (Stored) | Stored at Carlisle Canal-42067/98, 42449, 42720/52/5, 42835/6, 43045/139, 47520, 61064, 64499, 64877/8/95/9, 65237 an 69155. | SLS/196304 |
29/04/1963 | Coventry (Stored) | On 29th April a Cathedral special from Newcastle was worked throughout by Peak D192 (52A) instead of the usual V2; three of latter class failed on similar specials during April. On lst May, 70035 (40B) worked a special evening coke train from Coventry Gas Works to Immingham. Commencing April, a twice weekly car train is scheduled to run between the new Rootes factory at Linwood and the Rootes factory at Coventry; the trains run to Gosford Green goods station (Coventry avoiding line) arriving at 3-45 a.m. and are worked throughout by two Polmadie Type 1 d/es which then run to Rugby, l.e., and return from Gosford Green at 5 p.m. Since running, D8119-8128 have all been noted on this turn. | SLS/196304 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
14/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1064 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25820 Allocated to Kittybrewster (KIT) |
||
04/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 04/09/1946. Dep: 04/09/1946. | ||
10/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/09/1946. Dep: 10/09/1946. | ||
17/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/10/1946. Dep: 17/10/1946. | ||
05/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Inverurie Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/02/1947. Dep: 08/02/1947. Work undertaken: Tablet catcher apparatus fitted |
||
14/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (KEI) | ||
19/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1948. Dep: 13/03/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1064 |
||
23/10/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61064 | ||
28/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
03/09/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 07/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. | ||
17/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/10/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. | ||
12/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1953. Dep: 05/03/1953. | ||
28/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/04/1954. Dep: 31/05/1954. Work undertaken: After collision with 62012 |
||
18/05/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (68E) | ||
28/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/06/1955. Dep: 06/08/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28878 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/06/1957. Dep: 12/07/1957. | ||
11/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 11/02/1959. Dep: 11/03/1959. | ||
22/08/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1960. Dep: 07/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28622 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
12/08/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
15/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61064 from Carlisle Canal (12C) | ||
07/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |