|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1948 | 15/03/1948 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 5125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 9865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 27/01/1952 | 01/03/1952 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 28249 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/03/1952 | 04/03/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gorton Works | 06/03/1954 | 03/04/1954 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 07/02/1956 | 05/03/1956 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/02/1958 | 15/03/1958 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1959 | 18/11/1959 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1960 | 09/01/1961 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 20/03/1961 | 28/04/1961 | 40 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/07/1962 | Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) | Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. | SLS/196209 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1063 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25819 Allocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
09/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1948. Dep: 15/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5125 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/03/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61063 | ||
19/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
11/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9865 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1952. Dep: 01/03/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28249 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/03/1952. Dep: 04/03/1952. | ||
06/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1954. Dep: 03/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28187 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/02/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1956. Dep: 05/03/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/10/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
11/11/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (38C) | ||
17/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1958. Dep: 15/03/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1959. Dep: 18/11/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28369 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/03/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (14D) | ||
30/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (15E) | ||
12/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1960. Dep: 09/01/1961. | ||
20/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/03/1961. Dep: 28/04/1961. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
17/03/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
26/03/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61063 from Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
13/04/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |