|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 05/12/1947 | 27/12/1947 | 23 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/03/1949 | 07/05/1949 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61061 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 23/12/1949 | 26/12/1949 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 28/05/1951 | 07/07/1951 | 41 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1952 | 14/08/1952 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/12/1952 | 23/12/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 28/09/1953 | 17/10/1953 | 20 days | General | Boiler number 28364 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 19/10/1953 | 20/10/1953 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Gateshead Works | 17/02/1955 | 23/03/1955 | 35 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/10/1955 | 04/11/1955 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/09/1956 | 01/12/1956 | 76 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1958 | 07/05/1958 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1958 | 19/05/1958 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 21/05/1959 | 05/06/1959 | 16 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 31/01/1961 | 03/03/1961 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. | SLS/195002 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1061 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25817 Allocated to Perth (LNER) (PTH) |
||
05/12/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1947. Dep: 27/12/1947. | ||
23/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 23/03/1949. Dep: 07/05/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61061 |
||
23/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/12/1949. Dep: 26/12/1949. | ||
05/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
11/02/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (64A) | ||
28/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1951. Dep: 07/07/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/08/1952. Dep: 14/08/1952. | ||
23/12/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 23/12/1952. Dep: 23/12/1952. | ||
28/09/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1953. Dep: 17/10/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28364 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/10/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/10/1953. Dep: 20/10/1953. | ||
17/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/02/1955. Dep: 23/03/1955. | ||
10/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1955. Dep: 04/11/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 17/09/1956. Dep: 01/12/1956. | ||
10/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1958. Dep: 07/05/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28235 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 13/05/1958. Dep: 19/05/1958. | ||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
14/09/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
05/10/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) | ||
21/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 21/05/1959. Dep: 05/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
31/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1961. Dep: 03/03/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28430 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
13/09/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61061 from Ardsley (56B) | ||
10/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |