|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 15/01/1947 | 08/03/1947 | 53 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 31/05/1948 | 30/07/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61053 |
||
Stratford Works | 04/04/1949 | 22/04/1949 | 19 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/07/1949 | 16/09/1949 | 71 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 24/04/1950 | 10/06/1950 | 48 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 26/09/1950 | 14/11/1950 | 50 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 29/03/1951 | 27/04/1951 | 30 days | Heavy | Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 18/07/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 10/04/1952 | 08/05/1952 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 29/04/1954 | 22/05/1954 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1954 | 26/05/1954 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 08/03/1956 | 05/04/1956 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28155 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 13/05/1957 | 29/05/1957 | 17 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 16/05/1958 | 18/06/1958 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/12/1960 | 19/01/1961 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
27/06/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1053 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25809 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/01/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/01/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947. | ||
31/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1948. Dep: 30/07/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28543 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61053 |
||
04/04/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/04/1949. Dep: 22/04/1949. | ||
08/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/07/1949. Dep: 16/09/1949. | ||
24/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1950. Dep: 10/06/1950. | ||
26/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 26/09/1950. Dep: 14/11/1950. | ||
29/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 29/03/1951. Dep: 27/04/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 18/07/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
10/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 10/04/1952. Dep: 08/05/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28260 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1954. Dep: 22/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28551 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1954. Dep: 26/05/1954. | ||
08/03/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1956. Dep: 05/04/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28155 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/05/1957. Dep: 29/05/1957. | ||
16/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1958. Dep: 18/06/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28816 (Diagram 100A) |
||
05/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1960. Dep: 19/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28308 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
25/02/1963 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61053 from York (North) (50A) | ||
13/03/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Darlington |