|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 18/07/1947 | 02/08/1947 | 16 days | Heavy | Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 29/02/1948 | 27/03/1948 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 5074 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61052 |
||
Stratford Works | 09/05/1949 | 21/05/1949 | 13 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Stratford Works | 04/09/1949 | 28/10/1949 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 9923 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/02/1950 | 22/02/1950 | 2 days | Weighing | |||
Stratford Works | 29/04/1951 | 22/06/1951 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/01/1953 | 13/03/1953 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/09/1954 | 23/10/1954 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/05/1956 | 21/07/1956 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 10/12/1956 | 20/12/1956 | 11 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 11/06/1958 | 14/08/1958 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/09/1958 | 22/10/1958 | 31 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/10/1960 | 29/10/1960 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/06/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1052 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25808 Allocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
||
17/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
18/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/07/1947. Dep: 02/08/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/02/1948. Dep: 27/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5074 (Diagram 100A) Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61052 |
||
09/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 09/05/1949. Dep: 21/05/1949. | ||
04/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 04/09/1949. Dep: 28/10/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9923 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Weighing) - Arr: 21/02/1950. Dep: 22/02/1950. | ||
24/09/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) | ||
29/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 29/04/1951. Dep: 22/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A) |
||
26/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1953. Dep: 13/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28527 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/09/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1954. Dep: 23/10/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28452 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1956. Dep: 21/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 10834 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/12/1956. Dep: 20/12/1956. | ||
11/06/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1958. Dep: 14/08/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/09/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/09/1958. Dep: 22/10/1958. | ||
01/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
04/10/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/10/1960. Dep: 29/10/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28253 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61052 from March (31B) | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |