|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 02/11/1947 | 31/12/1947 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 5062 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 25/06/1948 | 19/08/1948 | 56 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61050 |
||
Stratford Works | 27/01/1950 | 25/04/1950 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 3836 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/09/1951 | 11/10/1951 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/03/1953 | 25/04/1953 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 20/04/1954 | 28/05/1954 | 39 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/07/1956 | 09/08/1956 | 23 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 14/06/1957 | 11/07/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 15/07/1957 | 17/07/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/08/1959 | 22/09/1959 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28978 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/01/1961 | 11/02/1961 | 13 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1962 | 31/07/1962 | 58 days | General | Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
25/03/1950 | Stratford Works | One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. | SLS/195005 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
17/06/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1050 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25806 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5062 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/06/1948. Dep: 19/08/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61050 |
||
27/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1950. Dep: 25/04/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3836 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
19/05/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
16/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1951. Dep: 11/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28152 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
03/11/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
03/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1953. Dep: 25/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28554 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
23/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
20/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 20/04/1954. Dep: 28/05/1954. | ||
13/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) |
||
10/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
18/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 18/07/1956. Dep: 09/08/1956. | ||
14/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 14/06/1957. Dep: 11/07/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28568 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/07/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 15/07/1957. Dep: 17/07/1957. | ||
20/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1959. Dep: 22/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28978 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/01/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 11/02/1961. | ||
04/06/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1962. Dep: 31/07/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28869 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Canklow (41D) | ||
28/03/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
11/07/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
10/02/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61050 from Shirebrook (41J) | ||
03/1966 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 30 | ||
10/1968 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hesslewoods: Attercliffe |