|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 26/03/1947 | 21/05/1947 | 57 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 25/02/1948 | 20/03/1948 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3610 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61049 |
||
Stratford Works | 14/02/1949 | 19/03/1949 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 29/11/1949 | 05/12/1949 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 20/06/1950 | 05/08/1950 | 47 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 12/12/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 5 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 16/02/1951 | 24/02/1951 | 9 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 24/03/1952 | 18/04/1952 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28414 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 31/03/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/07/1956 | 29/08/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 03/02/1958 | 11/03/1958 | 37 days | Light Casual | Derailment damage |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1959 | 15/04/1959 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/04/1959 | 15/05/1959 | 23 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 28/07/1959 | 29/07/1959 | 2 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 12/10/1962 | 14/11/1962 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/05/1963 | 31/05/1963 | 8 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/1955 | Sunderland Station | On Saturday, 8th January, 1955, two football specials were run from Burnley and other Lancashire towns to Sunderland. Both trains were made up to 11 coach formation with a cafeteria coach included and one ran via the coast line through West Hartlepool and the other via Durham. The coast line train was hauled by Jubilee No. 45584 (24E) and the other train was hauled by Class 5 No. 45078 (24A). In addition, an excursion from Darlington was hauled by No. 61049 (51A). On the return trip, No. 45078 was given banking assistance out of Sunderland onto the Durham line by a G5 0-4-4T. On Tuesday, January 18th, 1955, Class Ll No. 67741, newly ex-works after overhaul, was the engine on the 9.0 a.m. slow from Sunderland to Newcastle. Austerity No. 90597 (36B), also ex-works, was observed on Saturday, 22nd January, 1955, passing through Sunderland on a south-bound goods. | SLS/195503 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/06/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1049 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25805 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
26/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1947. Dep: 21/05/1947. | ||
25/02/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1948. Dep: 20/03/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3610 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61049 |
||
14/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/02/1949. Dep: 19/03/1949. | ||
29/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/11/1949. Dep: 05/12/1949. | ||
20/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1950. Dep: 05/08/1950. | ||
12/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 12/12/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. | ||
16/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/02/1951. Dep: 24/02/1951. | ||
02/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
08/09/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
24/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1952. Dep: 18/04/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28414 (Diagram 100A) |
||
31/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28353 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/07/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1956. Dep: 29/08/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28447 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 11/03/1958. Work undertaken: Derailment damage |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
11/03/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1959. Dep: 15/04/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28214 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
23/04/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 23/04/1959. Dep: 15/05/1959. | ||
28/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/07/1959. Dep: 29/07/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
11/09/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/10/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/10/1962. Dep: 14/11/1962. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28429 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/05/1963 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 24/05/1963. Dep: 31/05/1963. | ||
07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61049 from York (North) (50A) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |