|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 12/08/1947 | 01/09/1947 | 21 days | Heavy | Boiler number 5064 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 30/03/1948 | 29/04/1948 | 31 days | General | Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61048 |
||
Stratford Works | 22/05/1948 | 11/06/1948 | 21 days | Unclassified | Specially painted |
||
Stratford Works | 29/07/1949 | 13/08/1949 | 16 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/11/1949 | 07/01/1950 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 14/06/1950 | 28/06/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/10/1950 | 24/10/1950 | 20 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/06/1951 | 20/07/1951 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/07/1951 | 30/07/1951 | 6 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 28/01/1953 | 20/03/1953 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 14/02/1955 | 01/04/1955 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 24/04/1957 | 14/06/1957 | 52 days | General | Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 21/07/1958 | 13/08/1958 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/07/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 13/04/1960 | 14/05/1960 | 32 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
26/06/1948 | Shenfield MPD | On 26/6, 'B.1' Nos. 61048/54 were noted here, painted in the experimental mixed traffic livery, i.e., black and lined in accordance with ex L.N.W.R. practice. | SLS/194808 |
18/03/1959 | FA Cup excursions | The Norwich-Luton cup replay of 18th March brought the following to Birmingham New Street-Bls 61046/8 of 32A, 61204 of 31F and 61270/317 of 32A; Class 5s 44810/6 an 45238, all 14A. | SLS/195904 |
21/11/1960 | G.E. Dieselisation | Extensive dieselisation has taken place on the GE and a considerable re-shuffle of diesels between March, Ipswich and Stratford took place on 21st November. Cambridge has lost all its passenger turns (steam) and its entire allocation of Bls (61046/8/66/71/82, 61236/52/3/4/80/3) has been transferred to March and Norwich, leaving 16 steam engines allocated. South Lynn is now a sub-shed of March, its allocation being 43089/90, 65548/77 an 68499. Lowestoft has lost its 3 steam engines (65462, 65588 and 68642) to store at Trowse and is completely diesel, i.e. D2039, D2553/5/68/70/3. | SLS/196101 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/06/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1048 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25804 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
12/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 12/08/1947. Dep: 01/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5064 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1948. Dep: 29/04/1948. Work undertaken: Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR 61048 |
||
22/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/05/1948. Dep: 11/06/1948. Work undertaken: Specially painted |
||
29/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 29/07/1949. Dep: 13/08/1949. | ||
27/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1949. Dep: 07/01/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 5066 (Diagram 100A) |
||
14/06/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 14/06/1950. Dep: 28/06/1950. | ||
05/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/10/1950. Dep: 24/10/1950. | ||
18/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1951. Dep: 20/07/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28147 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/07/1951. Dep: 30/07/1951. | ||
28/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/01/1953. Dep: 20/03/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28555 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
14/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 14/02/1955. Dep: 01/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28292 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 24/04/1957. Dep: 14/06/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28186 (Diagram 100A) |
||
21/07/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/07/1958. Dep: 13/08/1958. | ||
27/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28541 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
13/04/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 13/04/1960. Dep: 14/05/1960. | ||
12/06/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
20/11/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
11/06/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61048 from Stratford (30A) | ||
03/12/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |