|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cowlairs Works | 02/06/1946 | 06/06/1946 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 17/06/1947 | 05/07/1947 | 19 days | Heavy | Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 08/01/1948 | 11/02/1948 | 35 days | Heavy | Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1045 |
||
Stratford Works | 22/08/1948 | 25/09/1948 | 35 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61045 |
||
Stratford Works | 08/05/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/07/1949 | 19/08/1949 | 29 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 05/05/1950 | 19/05/1950 | 15 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 28/11/1950 | 20/01/1951 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 15/03/1951 | 22/03/1951 | 8 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 27/09/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Stratford Works | 01/07/1952 | 22/08/1952 | 53 days | General | Boiler number 28589 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 13/01/1954 | 13/02/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 17/10/1955 | 25/01/1956 | 101 days | General | Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 03/02/1958 | 03/04/1958 | 60 days | General | Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Stratford Works | 19/05/1958 | 05/06/1958 | 18 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/09/1959 | 16/10/1959 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/06/1960 | 09/07/1960 | 38 days | General | Boiler number 28218 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
12/02/1948 | Stratford Works (Running Shed) | The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 | SLS/194803 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
24/05/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1045 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25802 Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
02/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/06/1946. Dep: 06/06/1946. | ||
17/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 17/06/1947. Dep: 05/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28505 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/01/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Heavy) - Arr: 08/01/1948. Dep: 11/02/1948. Work undertaken: Front end heater connection fitted Renumbered to BR (BR Tmp) number E1045 |
||
22/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/08/1948. Dep: 25/09/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61045 |
||
08/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3619 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/07/1949. Dep: 19/08/1949. | ||
05/05/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/05/1950. Dep: 19/05/1950. | ||
28/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 28/11/1950. Dep: 20/01/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28521 (Diagram 100A) |
||
15/03/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/03/1951. Dep: 22/03/1951. | ||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. | ||
01/07/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 01/07/1952. Dep: 22/08/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28589 (Diagram 100A) |
||
13/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28166 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1955. Dep: 25/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28517 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/02/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1958. Dep: 03/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28445 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
19/05/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 19/05/1958. Dep: 05/06/1958. | ||
23/09/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/09/1959. Dep: 16/10/1959. | ||
02/06/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1960. Dep: 09/07/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28218 (Diagram 100A) |
||
04/02/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
29/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61045 from Stratford (30A) | ||
26/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |