|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stratford Works | 03/10/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 51 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 05/04/1948 | 22/04/1948 | 18 days | Unclassified | Renumbered to BR 61041 |
||
Stratford Works | 19/07/1948 | 21/08/1948 | 34 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 10/10/1949 | 12/11/1949 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 9901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 22/11/1949 | 28/11/1949 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/08/1950 | 12/09/1950 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Stratford Works | 23/04/1951 | 26/05/1951 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 28553 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Stratford Works | 09/03/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 55 days | General | Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 23/06/1955 | 21/07/1955 | 29 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 26/04/1957 | 23/05/1957 | 28 days | General | Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 30/05/1957 | 31/05/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 18/02/1959 | 19/03/1959 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/03/1961 | 22/04/1961 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 28360 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/09/1963 | Lincoln MPD | The allocation of D1531/2/3/4 to Darnall has released Brush d/es D5801/2/3/53/4 for work at Lincoln and eventual elimination of steam but on 9th September the steam allocation was-43086/95/104/5/49, 61006/26/41/2/58/89/95/107/13/62/223/58/348/84/409, 90223/460/577. | SLS/196310 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
26/04/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1041 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25797 Allocated to Stratford (STR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
19/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. | ||
05/04/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/04/1948. Dep: 22/04/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61041 |
||
19/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/07/1948. Dep: 21/08/1948. | ||
10/10/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1949. Dep: 12/11/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9901 (Diagram 100A) |
||
22/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/11/1949. Dep: 28/11/1949. | ||
16/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/08/1950. Dep: 12/09/1950. | ||
23/04/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1951. Dep: 26/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28553 (Diagram 100A) |
||
09/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28552 (Diagram 100A) Modified bogie springs fitted |
||
18/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to To Southern Region (SR) | ||
27/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
07/06/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) | ||
23/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1955. Dep: 21/07/1955. | ||
26/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1957. Dep: 23/05/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28206 (Diagram 100A) |
||
30/05/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 30/05/1957. Dep: 31/05/1957. | ||
18/02/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1959. Dep: 19/03/1959. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28864 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/03/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1961. Dep: 22/04/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28360 (Diagram 100A) |
||
03/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) | ||
27/01/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
24/11/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
19/04/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61041 from New England (34E) | ||
06/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |