|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 28/02/1949 | 01/03/1949 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1950 | 03/05/1950 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9680 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61036 |
||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1952 | 25/01/1952 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1953 | 01/01/1954 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/11/1955 | 23/12/1955 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1956 | 16/11/1956 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1958 | 19/04/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 28169 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1959 | 05/09/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/03/1960 | 21/04/1960 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1947 | Darlington Works | New 'B.1' Class 4-6-0 No. 1036 (Dar. 2016/47) has appeared with the name Ralph Assheton, No. 1037 Jairou (Dar. 2017/47), No. 1038 Blacktail (Dar. 2018/47) and No. 1039 Steinbok (Dar. 2019/47); the plate dates of the last two are December. The first of the 'L1' Class 2-6-4T's to be built here, 9001 was completed in December and on 29/12 was in the Paint Shop. A number of 'Atlantics' have arrived on Works and include 'C6' Nos. 2931/34/41/47; 'Cl' 2991/96; with the exception of No. 2941, all have recently been withdrawn. 'D2' No. 2178 and 'C1' No. 2835 have now gone in for scrapping, while the last 'B15' No. 1696 is on the Works road at the shed. No. 508 is awaiting shops. | SLS/194801 |
30/04/1950 | Doncaster Works | Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
20/11/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1036, name: RALPH ASSHETON Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2016 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
28/02/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 28/02/1949. Dep: 01/03/1949. | ||
03/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
09/07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
25/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
27/08/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
20/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
02/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
29/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1950. Dep: 03/05/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9680 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61036 |
||
02/01/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1952. Dep: 25/01/1952. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28171 (Diagram 100A) |
||
07/12/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1953. Dep: 01/01/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28100 (Diagram 100A) |
||
29/11/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1955. Dep: 23/12/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28757 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/11/1956. Dep: 16/11/1956. | ||
19/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1958. Dep: 19/04/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28169 (Diagram 100A) |
||
27/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 27/08/1959. Dep: 05/09/1959. | ||
14/03/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1960. Dep: 21/04/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28241 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61036 from Doncaster (36A) | ||
01/11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |