|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 12/07/1949 | 22/08/1949 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 9836 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61034 |
||
Darlington Works | 01/06/1951 | 27/06/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/08/1953 | 01/09/1953 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 12/12/1955 | 11/01/1956 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 18/11/1957 | 14/12/1957 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1957 | 17/12/1957 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 11/05/1959 | 27/05/1959 | 17 days | Unclassified | BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 10/07/1959 | 06/10/1959 | 89 days | Heavy Casual | After collision |
||
Darlington Works | 07/01/1960 | 25/01/1961 | 385 days | General | Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/10/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1034, name: CHIRU Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2014 Allocated to York (North) (YK) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
29/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) | ||
06/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
12/02/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stockton (SKN) | ||
12/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/07/1949. Dep: 22/08/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9836 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61034 |
||
01/06/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1951. Dep: 27/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28220 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/08/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1953. Dep: 01/09/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28216 (Diagram 100A) |
||
12/12/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1955. Dep: 11/01/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28168 (Diagram 100A) |
||
18/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1957. Dep: 14/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28315 (Diagram 100A) |
||
16/12/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 16/12/1957. Dep: 17/12/1957. | ||
11/05/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/05/1959. Dep: 27/05/1959. Work undertaken: BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
14/06/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) | ||
10/07/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1959. Dep: 06/10/1959. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
07/01/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1960. Dep: 25/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28398 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
21/12/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61034 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
02/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Drapers: Hull |