|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 15/06/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 18 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61023 |
||
Darlington Works | 11/03/1949 | 09/04/1949 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 17/05/1949 | 26/05/1949 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 05/04/1950 | 02/05/1950 | 28 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 07/05/1951 | 02/06/1951 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28212 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 20/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 25/05/1953 | 28/05/1953 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 04/04/1955 | 30/04/1955 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 02/05/1955 | 03/05/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Darlington Works | 19/06/1957 | 03/08/1957 | 46 days | General | Boiler number 28863 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 16/12/1960 | 28/01/1961 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 29/12/1961 | 11/01/1962 | 14 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. | SLS/194905 |
30/04/1949 | Darlington Works | New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84. Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460. |
SLS/194906 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/04/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1023, name: HIROLA Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2003 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
15/06/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/06/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61023 |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
11/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1949. Dep: 09/04/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3763 (Diagram 100A) |
||
17/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1949. Dep: 26/05/1949. | ||
05/04/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 05/04/1950. Dep: 02/05/1950. | ||
07/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1951. Dep: 02/06/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28212 (Diagram 100A) |
||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28110 (Diagram 100A) |
||
25/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1953. Dep: 28/05/1953. | ||
04/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1955. Dep: 30/04/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28126 (Diagram 100A) |
||
02/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/05/1955. Dep: 03/05/1955. | ||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
25/09/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
19/06/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 19/06/1957. Dep: 03/08/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28863 (Diagram 100A) |
||
08/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
08/11/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (56B) | ||
16/12/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1960. Dep: 28/01/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28434 (Diagram 100A) BR Automatic Warning System (AWS) fitted |
||
29/12/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/12/1961. Dep: 11/01/1962. | ||
17/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (56C) | ||
08/09/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
05/01/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) | ||
12/04/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Low Moor (56F) | ||
31/10/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61023 from Low Moor (56F) | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Hughes Bolckows: North Blyth |