|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Darlington Works | 03/01/1949 | 03/02/1949 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 3705 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61022 |
||
Darlington Works | 15/06/1949 | 24/06/1949 | 10 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 04/09/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 23/05/1951 | 22/04/1951 | -30 days | General | |||
Darlington Works | 07/11/1952 | 07/11/1952 | 1 day | Weighing | |||
Darlington Works | 05/05/1953 | 30/05/1953 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 05/08/1954 | 15/09/1954 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 28170 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 11/08/1955 | 12/08/1955 | 2 days | Light Casual | |||
Gateshead Works | 06/10/1955 | 18/10/1955 | 13 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 30/04/1956 | 29/05/1956 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Gateshead Works | 28/11/1956 | 04/12/1956 | 7 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 10/12/1956 | 04/01/1957 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Darlington Works | 17/11/1958 | 16/12/1958 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 22/06/1959 | 30/06/1959 | 9 days | Unclassified | Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
Darlington Works | 21/09/1961 | 14/10/1961 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 28408 (Diagram 100A) |
||
Darlington Works | 24/09/1962 | 01/10/1962 | 8 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1949 | Darlington Works | Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). | SLS/194904 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/03/1947 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1022, name: SASSABY Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 2002 Allocated to Heaton (HTN) Diagram 100A boiler fitted |
||
07/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (DAR) | ||
03/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 03/01/1949. Dep: 03/02/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3705 (Diagram 100A) Renumbered to BR 61022 |
||
15/06/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 15/06/1949. Dep: 24/06/1949. | ||
04/09/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 04/09/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. | ||
22/04/1951 | Modification | Diagram 100A number 28213 boiler fitted | ||
23/05/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1951. Dep: 22/04/1951. | ||
06/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (50A) | ||
14/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Darlington (51A) | ||
07/11/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Weighing) - Arr: 07/11/1952. Dep: 07/11/1952. | ||
05/05/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1953. Dep: 30/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28304 (Diagram 100A) |
||
19/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
26/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
05/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1954. Dep: 15/09/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28170 (Diagram 100A) |
||
11/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/08/1955. Dep: 12/08/1955. | ||
06/10/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 06/10/1955. Dep: 18/10/1955. | ||
30/04/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1956. Dep: 29/05/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28454 (Diagram 100A) |
||
28/11/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gateshead Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 28/11/1956. Dep: 04/12/1956. | ||
10/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/12/1956. Dep: 04/01/1957. | ||
17/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1958. Dep: 16/12/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28700 (Diagram 100A) Mechanical elements of ATC fitted |
||
22/06/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 22/06/1959. Dep: 30/06/1959. Work undertaken: Electrical elements of ATC fitted |
||
10/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) | ||
21/09/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1961. Dep: 14/10/1961. Work undertaken: Boiler number 28408 (Diagram 100A) |
||
24/09/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Darlington Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/09/1962. Dep: 01/10/1962. | ||
04/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Alnmouth (52d) | ||
24/02/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton (52B) | ||
16/06/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) | ||
31/01/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) | ||
25/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61022 from Wakefield (56A) | ||
02/1967 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |